IL HB2071 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Cook County Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a participant may establish service credit and earnings credit for periods of furlough beginning on or after December 1, 2017 and ending on or before November 30, 2018 if the participant applies before December 31, 2019, makes a specified contribution, and meets other criteria. Provides that a participant may establish earnings credit for periods of salary reduction beginning on or after December 1, 2017 and ending on or before November 30, 2018 if the participant applies before December 31, 2019, makes a specified contribution, and meets other criteria. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-COOK CO-FURLOUGH CREDIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0011
2019-06-07HouseEffective Date June 7, 2019
2019-06-07HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-01HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-004-000
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2019
2019-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2019
2019-05-22SenateDo Pass Government Accountability and Pensions; 010-000-000
2019-05-16SenateAssigned to Government Accountability and Pensions
2019-05-16SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 24, 2019
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-036-000
2019-03-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-27HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-03-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-03-12HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-08HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2019-03-08HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2019-03-06HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2019-03-06HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-03-06HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2019-03-05HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2019-03-05HousePension Note Filed
2019-03-05HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-03-05HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2019-03-05HouseJudicial Note Filed
2019-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-004-000
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-02-05HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
4059-179.4New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback