IL HB2067 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that vehicles operated by a not-for-profit emergency management organization are not prohibited from using red or white oscillating, rotating, or flashing lights. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-NOT-FOR-PROFIT EMERGENC
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Tabled |
2019-02-28 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2019-02-27 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2067&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2067.htm |