IL HB2063 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1037
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1037
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.
Title
CIVIL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1037 |
2018-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-001-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-20 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate *** |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate *** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 1-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |