IL HB2063 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIVIL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-001-000
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-25HouseArrived in House
2018-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-22SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-20HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73551-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback