IL HB2045 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0086
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that neither the Department of Corrections nor the Department of Juvenile Justice may require a committed person or person committed to any facility operated by the Department of Juvenile Justice to pay any co-payment for receiving medical or dental services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-CO PAYMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0086
2019-07-19HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-07-19HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-012-000
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-03-07HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-05HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 006-000-000
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-04HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-6-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback