IL HB2033 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Debt Reform Act. Provides that an ordinance levying a tax for the payment of principal of and interest on general obligation bonds or limited bonds may be filed electronically with the county clerk. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOV BONDS-ORDINANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0137 |
2023-06-30 | House | Effective Date June 30, 2023 |
2023-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2023 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Stephens |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 350 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |