IL HB2031 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Water Use Act of 1983. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSERVATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2017-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-04-07HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
525451Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback