IL HB2028 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-12)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0028
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Police Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall pay directly or reimburse, up to a maximum of $20,000 (rather than $10,000) the burial expenses of each State police officer who is killed in the line of duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ST POLICE-BURIAL REIMBURSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0028
2019-06-26HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-06-26HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 012-000-000
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
2019-03-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-02-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 015-000-000
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
2019-02-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-02-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-02-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20261012.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback