IL HB2028 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 010-000-000
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-15SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-000-000
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52051.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback