IL HB1976 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0672
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0672
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Public Act 102-578. Changes the effective date of the Act from December 31, 2022 to July 1, 2022. Amends the Travel Insurance Article of the Illinois Insurance Code to provide that travel insurance that provides coverage for sickness, accident, disability, or death occurring during travel or incidental limited property and casualty benefits such as baggage or trip cancellation may be filed for purposes of rates and forms under either an accident and health line of insurance or an inland marine line of insurance (instead of just under an inland marine line of insurance). Effective immediately.
Title
OPTOMETRIC PRACTICE-TELEHEALTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-27 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0672 |
2021-11-30 | House | Effective Date November 30, 2021 |
2021-11-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-11-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-10-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-10-27 | House | House Concurs |
2021-10-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 116-001-001 |
2021-10-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-10-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-001-001 |
2021-10-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-10-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-10-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-10-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-10-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 013-000-000 |
2021-10-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 013-000-000 |
2021-10-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-10-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-10-27 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-10-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2021-10-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Fine |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)(ii) this bill shall not be re-referred to the Committee on Assignment pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading August 31, 2021 |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-005-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 80 | 15.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 80 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |