IL HB1970 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Funeral Directors and Embalmers Licensing Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning legislative intent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 014-000-000
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-03HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady
2017-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225411-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback