IL HB1969 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Executive Ethics Commission for its FY24 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$EX ETHICS-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-27HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2023-03-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2023-03-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2023-02-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2023-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback