IL HB1960 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Black Wall Street Program Act. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to create and administer the Black Wall Street Program to provide loans and financial assistance to designated communities for the creation of Black Wall Street Business Districts. Specifies further requirements concerning Program eligibility and the disbursement of loan funds under the Program. Requires each municipality receiving a loan under the Program to establish a municipal investment program by which loan funds are dispersed to qualified African American business entities and persons for the purpose of establishing Black Wall Street Business Districts. Allows for the use of loan funds to invest in, issue, or sell bonds for the purpose of the construction of Black Wall Street Business Districts and all related matters. Requires the Department to compile and make available to the public a database of qualified African American contractors and engineers. Requires the Department to create and administer a Black Wall Street Investment Hub for the purposes of providing specified assistance to African American business entities and persons in establishing Black Wall Street businesses. Provides for the adoption of administrative rules. Creates the Black Wall Street Fund as a special fund in the State treasury for specified purposes. Defines terms. Makes conforming changes.
Title
BLACK WALL STREET PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1) this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1) this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |