IL HB1957 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Changes the filing due date applicable to actuarial opinions as to the sufficiency of the loss and loss adjustment expense reserves for group workers' compensation pools from June 1 to March 1 of each year. In provisions concerning the bond required of insurance producers, changes a reference from "agent contact" to "agency contract". Provides that the corporate governance annual disclosure must attest to the best of the signatory's belief and knowledge that the insurer has implemented the corporate governance practices (rather than the corporate governance practices required by the provisions concerning disclosure requirements) and that a copy of the disclosure has been provided to the insurer's board of directors or the appropriate committee thereof. Provides that an insurer must ensure that it has complied with the financial requirements and treatment limitations applicable to mental, emotional, nervous, or substance use disorder or condition benefits prior to policy issuance. Provides that pre-licensing course of study hours required to be completed in a classroom setting in order to obtain an insurance producer license may also be completed in a webinar setting. Provides that 3 hours of classroom ethics instruction required for renewal of a public adjuster license may also be completed by webinar. Defines "webinar". Repeals an Article concerning public insurance adjusters and registered firms. Effective immediately, except that provisions concerning the filing due date applicable to actuarial opinions take effect January 1, 2022.
Title
INS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0135 |
2021-07-23 | House | Effective Date July 23, 2021; some provisions effective 1-1-22 |
2021-07-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2021 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-001 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Insurance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 107a.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 130.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 1510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 1565 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 370c.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 500-130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 500-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | Art. XXXI.75 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |