IL HB1954 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0588
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0588
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides that the first full week of April of each year is designated as Autism Acceptance Week (rather than Autism Awareness Week). Makes conforming changes.
Title
AUTISM AWARENESS DAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0588 |
2021-08-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mental Health & Addiction Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 630 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 15-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 490 | 137 | New Code | See Bill Text |