IL HB1954 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-24 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-24HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-24HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-24House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 096-001-000
2017-06-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 096-001-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee; 008-000-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee; 008-000-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee
2017-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dan Brady
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dan Brady
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Holmes
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 013-000-000
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 012-000-000
2017-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-001-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee; 012-000-000
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-29HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21551Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1954&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1954.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1954eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1954enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1954ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1954sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1954sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB1954_04282017_042000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB1954_05262017_026000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB1954_06242017_013000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback