IL HB1952 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that the juvenile law enforcement records of a person who before his or her 18th birthday has committed an act which if committed by an adult would constitute a criminal violation under the Cannabis Control Act or a criminal violation of the Drug Paraphernalia Control Act with respect to cannabis are subject to automatic expungement. Provides that the law enforcement agency who initiated the violation shall automatically expunge, on or before January 1 and July 1 of each year, the juvenile law enforcement records of a person eligible under this provision. Provides that the law enforcement agency shall provide by rule the process for access, review, and confirmation of the automatic expungement by the law enforcement agency. Provides that the clerk of the circuit court shall expunge, upon order of the court, or in the absence of a court order on or before January 1 and July 1 of each year, the juvenile court records of a person who before his or her 18th birthday has committed an act which if committed by an adult would constitute a criminal violation under the Cannabis Control Act or a criminal violation of the Drug Paraphernalia Control Act with respect to cannabis in the clerk's possession or control and which contains the final satisfactory disposition which pertain to a person eligible under this provision. Effective immediately.
Title
JUV CT-CANNABIS-EXPUNGEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-04-20 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2021-04-15 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |