IL HB1934 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Relative to the financial audits made annually by the Auditor General of the financial statements of all accounts, funds, and other moneys in the care, custody, or control of a regional superintendent of schools or educational service region, provides that the regional office of education or educational service center may utilize a cash basis, modified cash basis, or generally accepted accounting principles (GAAP) basis of accounting in the preparation of the financial statements. Makes changes to require audit reports to be published on the Auditor General's website and distributed in accordance with the Illinois State Auditing Act. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-FIN AUDIT-CASH BASIS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0025 |
2021-06-25 | House | Effective Date June 25, 2021 |
2021-06-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.17a | Amended Code | Citation Text |