IL HB1932 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code, Township Code, and Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the governing body of a county, township, or municipality may waive any fees or costs associated with a permit, inspection, or certification of occupancy required by law for construction, reconstruction, alteration, repair, movement to another site, removal, or demolition of a manufactured home, building, dwelling, or structure, either commercial or residential, damaged as a result of a disaster, emergency, weather event, or for any reason deemed warranted in the interests of public safety, welfare, and recovery of the community by the governing body of the county, township, or municipality. Defines "disaster". Effective immediately.
Title
BUILDING FEES AFTER DISASTER
Sponsors
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
Rep. Chris Bos [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
Sen. Craig Wilcox [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0024 |
2021-06-25 | House | Effective Date June 25, 2021 |
2021-06-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Cities & Villages Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-12001.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 110-12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-13-1.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |