IL HB1931 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Industrial Project Revenue Bond Act in the Illinois Municipal Code. In the definition of "industrial project", includes use or disposal of surplus real estate owned by the municipality. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI-INDUST PROJECT REVENUE
Sponsors
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Rep. Bradley Stephens [R] | Rep. Mark Luft [R] |
Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0239 |
2021-08-03 | House | Effective Date August 3, 2021 |
2021-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 27, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Cities & Villages Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |