IL HB1916 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall update its policy for providing notification of construction projects to the public. Provides that the policy shall include a requirement that the Department contact the highway commissioner located in each Department district that will be impacted by a proposed construction project. Provides that the policy shall be completed and published on the Department's website by January 1, 2022. Effective immediately.
Title
IDOT-CONSTRUCTION NOTIFICATION
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Sen. Brian Stewart [R] | Sen. Steve McClure [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
Sen. Craig Wilcox [R] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0393 |
2021-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2021 |
2021-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 019-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |