IL HB1915 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows the issuance of Fold of Honor special license plate decals by the Department of Veterans' Affairs. Provides that $10 of each original issuance and $23 of each renewal shall be deposited into the Folds of Honor Foundation Fund, and that $15 of each original issuance and $2 of each renewal shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that money in the Folds of Honor Foundation Fund shall be paid as grants to the Folds of Honor Foundation to aid in providing educational scholarships to military families. Makes a corresponding change in the State Finance Act.
Title
VEH CD-FOLD OF HONOR PLATES
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Marron [R] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0383 |
2021-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 019-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael T. Marron |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |