IL HB1910 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0591
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0591
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Water Reclamation District Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0591 |
2018-06-21 | House | Effective Date June 21, 2018 |
2018-06-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 099-006-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 099-006-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 3 |
2018-05-23 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Brady |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-12-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 9, 2017 |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000 |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Executive |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-002-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-24 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate *** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 2605 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |