IL HB1903 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code and Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that, in counties with a population of 3,000,000 or more and in all home rule municipalities, a corporation, limited liability company, or limited liability partnership may appear at an administrative hearing proceeding through any individual who has the authority to act on behalf of and with power to bind the respective corporation, limited liability company, or limited liability partnership in the matter that is the subject of the administrative hearing proceeding. Provides that the language may not be construed to permit appearances by any such individual in contested property tax proceedings. Effective immediately.
Title
REPRESENT CORP-ADMIN HEARING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | To Civil Procedure & Tort Liability Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-009-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-43027 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 1-2.1-5.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1903&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1903.htm |