IL HB1895 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Local Governmental Acceptance of Credit Cards Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateDo Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-04-04HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
503451Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback