IL HB1892 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID ACT-REPEAL
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] |
Rep. Adam Niemerg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1892&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1892.htm |