IL HB1861 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Dissolution of Townships in McHenry County Article of the Township Code. Makes the Article applicable to all counties. Amends the Counties Code and the Motor Fuel Tax Law making conforming changes. Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Changes provisions requiring road districts in townships in Lake County and McHenry County to be abolished if the roads of the road district are less than 15 miles in length to require all townships to abolish such road districts. Effective immediately.
Title
TWP CD-TOWNSHIP DISSOLUTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-03-26 | House | Remains in Counties & Townships Committee |
2021-03-26 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Counties & Townships Committee; 004-006-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 24-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 24-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 24-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 24-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 24-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | Art. 24 heading | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 5 | 6-135 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
605 | 5 | 6-140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1861&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1861.htm |