IL HB1858 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Organization Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the deposit of books, bills, documents, and papers with the Secretary of State.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Daniel Burke [D] |
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Christian Mitchell [D] | Rep. David Reis [R] | Rep. Chad Hays [R] |
Rep. Jerry Long [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-30 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-11-28 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-23 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate *** |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate *** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |