IL HB1858 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Organization Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the deposit of books, bills, documents, and papers with the Secretary of State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-23HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2553Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback