IL HB1855 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts from the engrossed bill only the provision that requires the Department of Natural Resources to file a report in writing to the General Assembly on or before March 1 of each year with the following information from the preceding year: the total number of agreements entered into under a provision concerning a forest development cost-share program, the total amount of payments made under that provision from the Illinois Forestry Development Fund, and the total number of acres that were affected by the payments. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILLINOIS FORESTRY FIX

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-26HouseSent to the Governor
2024-05-28HousePassed Both Houses
2024-05-28HouseHouse Concurs
2024-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
2024-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000
2024-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2024-05-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2024-05-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tony M. McCombie
2024-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2024-05-25HouseArrived in House
2024-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2024-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2024-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
2024-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2024-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2024-05-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
2024-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2024-05-23SenateDo Pass as Amended Agriculture; 011-000-000
2024-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2024-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2024-05-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2024-05-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
2024-05-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
2024-05-16SenatePostponed - Agriculture
2024-05-15SenateWaive Posting Notice
2024-05-14SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2024-04-26SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
2024-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2024-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2024-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
2024-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2024-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2024-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2024-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000
2024-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
2024-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2024-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2024-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2024-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2024-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2024-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie
2024-03-05HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-03-05HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2023-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2023-02-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2023-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
525151Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback