IL HB1853 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section creating the civil administrative agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-000-000
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-000-000
2018-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-05-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-25HouseArrived in House
2018-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2018-05-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-10SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-25SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-15SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-05-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-001-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2053Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback