IL HB1849 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that if a minor has previously been placed on probation for an offense that involves the use or possession of a firearm, the court may not place the minor on probation for any subsequent offense involving the use or possession of a firearm. Provides that a minor convicted of a subsequent offense involving the possession or discharge of a firearm not causing any injury shall be referred to social service programs through Juvenile Probation for no less than 3 months. Provides that if the minor does not complete the referral recommendations, the minor shall be committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice to complete the recommended services. Provides that a minor convicted of a subsequent offense involving the use of a firearm causing serious injury, great bodily harm, or death shall be committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice with the Department providing services including, but not limited to, education, mental health, drug treatment, and mentoring.
Title
JUV-SUBSEQUENT FIREARM OFFENSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-21 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-715 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1849&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1849.htm |