IL HB1849 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-15SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-002-000
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Police & First Responders Committee; 014-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Police & First Responders Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-29HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2051Amended CodeCitation Text
2051-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback