IL HB1848 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Code.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Reginald Phillips [R] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] |
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 To Resources and Management Subcommittee |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate *** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |