IL HB1839 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-28 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-28 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
DCEO-GOOD CORPORATE CITIZEN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-28 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)(ii) this bill shall not be re-referred to the Committee on Assignment pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading August 31, 2021 |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-005-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-001 |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-003-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |