IL HB1836 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Provides that for purposes of the ABLE account program, a designated beneficiary means the ABLE account owner. Provides that upon the death of a designated beneficiary, proceeds from an account may be transferred pursuant to a payable on death account agreement. Provides that upon the death of a designated beneficiary, the State Treasurer may require verification that the funeral and burial expenses of the designated beneficiary have been paid. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ST TREASURER-ABLE ACCOUNT PROG
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] |
Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0392 |
2021-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2021 |
2021-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 16.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |