IL HB1816 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Revenue Estimate Act. Provides that the General Assembly shall not enact any bill to appropriate funds within any fiscal year prior to its adoption of a joint resolution reflecting the estimate of funds available for that fiscal year as required under the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability Act. Effective immediately.
Title
NO FUNDS W/OUT REVENUE EST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1816&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1816.htm |