IL HB1814 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois False Claims Act. Provides that no court has jurisdiction over a civil action relating to or involving a false claim regarding certain tax acts administered by the Department of Revenue unless the action is brought by the Attorney General. Provides that the Department of Revenue has the sole authority to bring an administrative action and that the Attorney General has the sole authority to bring a judicial action under the Act for a false claim, statement, or record pertaining to certain taxes administered by the Department of Revenue. Contains provisions concerning reporting, investigative, and enforcement procedures for allegations of false claims pertaining to certain taxes. Contains provisions governing the payment of rewards to persons who provide information that leads to recovery of funds under the new provisions. Provides that the appeal of a determination regarding an award may be appealed exclusively to the Court of Claims and must be filed within 30 days of the determination of the award. Makes other changes, including a corresponding change in the Court of Claims Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FALSE CLAIMS ACT-TAX CLAIMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7055058Amended CodeCitation Text
7401754Amended CodeCitation Text
7401754.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback