IL HB1813 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Response) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Response) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department shall establish a Networking for Success Program. Provides that the program shall assist small to mid-sized businesses in strategic market research, geographic information systems, web design and search engine optimization, and social media marketing. Effective immediately.
Title
DCEO-SMALL BUSINESS PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | House | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto |
2017-08-28 | House | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-28 | House | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-08-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2017-08-11 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2017-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business Growth & Incentives Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Business Growth & Incentives Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |