IL HB1812 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Construction Law. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of the Law to the contrary, a disadvantaged school district may submit an application with the State Board of Education to waive any local matching funds requirements for a grant awarded under the Law until the project for which the grant was awarded is complete. Requires the State Board of Education to adopt rules. Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of the Act to the contrary, a disadvantaged community college district may submit an application with the Illinois Community College Board to waive any local matching funds requirements for a grant awarded to the district for a capital project until the capital project is complete. Requires the Illinois Community College Board to adopt rules.
Title
SCH CONSTRUCTION-MATCH FUNDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2022-03-02 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 230 | 5-500 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 5-13 | New Code | See Bill Text |