IL HB1808 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-11)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the Department of Revenue may share information with the State Treasurer for the purpose of administering the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. Amends the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. Provides that the State Treasurer shall, at least annually, notify the Department of Revenue of the names of persons appearing to be owners of abandoned property held by the State Treasurer, and that the Department of Revenue shall provide address and other information for such persons to the State Treasurer to facilitate the return of unclaimed property. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOR-TREASURER-UNCLAIMED PROP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-15HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-15SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-26SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-30HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-02-27HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-24HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355917Amended CodeCitation Text
765102519.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback