IL HB1805 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-10)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall offer to each applicant for issuance or renewal of a driver's license or identification card who is 16 years of age or older (rather than 18 years of age or older) the opportunity to have his or her name included in the First Person Consent organ and tissue donor registry. Amends the Illinois Anatomical Gift Act. Makes conforming changes. Provides that upon the death of a donor who is an unemancipated minor, the parent or guardian of the donor may amend or revoke the anatomical gift of the donor's body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ORGAN DONOR REGISTRY-AGE 16

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-15SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2017
2017-04-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-003-000
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-02HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-02HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-02HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-02HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62556-117Amended CodeCitation Text
755503Amended CodeCitation Text
755505Amended CodeCitation Text
755505-20Amended CodeCitation Text
755505-43Amended CodeCitation Text
755505-47Amended CodeCitation Text
755505-5Amended CodeCitation Text
755505-7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback