IL HB1802 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act with respect to the Illinois Student Assistance Commission. Provides that the term of office for the student member serving on the Commission shall be for 2 years from July 1 of each odd-numbered year and until a successor is appointed and qualified (instead of 2 years from July 1 of each odd-numbered year). In the case of a vacancy in the office of a student member, provides that the new student appointee shall hold office for the remainder of the term and until a successor is appointed and qualified (rather than the new student appointee shall hold office only for the remainder of the term). Makes technical changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ISAC-TERM OF STUDENT MEMBER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0023 |
2021-06-25 | House | Effective Date June 25, 2021 |
2021-06-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 012-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 947 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |