IL HB1800 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that a county board of a county that contracts with a person growing row crops on land adjacent to county highways to buy standing strips of the crops to remain in place to act as snow breaks along the highway may pay the grower an additional sum of money equal to at least 10% of the contract price (rather than a sum of money equal to 10% of the contract price) as an inconvenience fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HGHWY CD-SNOW BREAK-GROWER FEE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-15HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-15SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 008-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 006-000-000
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60555-412Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback