IL HB1791 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that if, after reviewing the evidence, including evidence provided from the Department of Children and Family Services, the court determines that the minor's current or planned placement is not necessary or appropriate to facilitate achievement of the permanency goal, the court shall put in writing the factual basis supporting this determination, enter specific findings based on the evidence, enter other orders necessary to protect the health, safety, and best interests of the minor and may direct the Department to implement a recommendation by a clinician, Department, or assigned agency. Provides that if the Department places a minor in a placement under an order, the Department may remove the minor from the placement when a change in circumstances necessitates the removal of the minor to protect the minor's health, safety, and best interest. Provides that if the Department determines a removal of the minor is necessary, the Department shall notify the minor's counsel or guardian ad litem of the planned placement change in writing no later than 10 days prior to the implementation of the Department's determination unless remaining in the placement poses an imminent risk of harm to the minor, in which case the Department shall notify the minor's counsel or guardian ad litem of the placement change in writing immediately following the implementation of the Department's determination. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT- PLACEMENT ORDERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-15HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-15SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Human Services; 007-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-30SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-02-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054052-23Amended CodeCitation Text
7054052-28Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback