IL HB1789 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that disabled veterans need not annually seek certification from the Illinois Department of Veterans' Affairs in order to continue receiving the exemption for veterans with disabilities. Makes conforming changes to the Mobile Home Local Services Tax Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-DISABLED VETERANS
Sponsors
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 515 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1789&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1789.htm |