IL HB1787 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. For FY17, provides a continuing appropriation for each State agency to meet personnel expenditures for each payroll period during which appropriations for personnel expenditures have not been made available to that State agency. Defines "State agency" to include all State agencies, the office of any constitutional officer, and any agency, board, commission, or other instrumentality of State government to which an appropriation for personnel expenditures was made from a State fund in FY15. Defines "personnel expenditure" and "applicable State fund". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVT-CONTINUING APPROP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2017-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2017-02-01HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-02-01HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-02-01HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2017-02-01HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-02-01HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-01HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-02-01HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-02-01HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-02-01HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-02-01HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-02-01HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-02-01HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-02-01HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152050-22Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback