IL HB1784 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a driver of a motor vehicle may, subject to certain requirements, overtake and pass to the left of a bicycle proceeding in the same direction on a portion of a highway designated as a no-passing zone. Provides that provisions concerning driving on the shoulder of a roadway shall not apply to any bicycle and a person operating a bicycle or motorized pedal cycle shall not be required to use the shoulder of a roadway when operating the bicycle or motorized pedal cycle. Provides that the rear of a bicycle may be equipped with a lamp emitting a steady or flashing red light (rather than solely a red light) visible from a distance of 500 feet in addition to or instead of a red reflector (rather than in addition to a red reflector).
Title
VEH CD-BICYCLES-MISC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0359 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Back To Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; |
2017-03-28 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-03-22 | House | To Highways & Transit Subcommittee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-02-01 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-02-01 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-1505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-1507 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-703 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-707 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-709.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |