IL HB1782 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Exempts from contract bidding requirements contracts for goods, services, or management in the operation of a school's food service, including a school that participates in any of the United States Department of Agriculture's child nutrition programs. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-CONTRACT-FOOD SERVICE
Sponsors
Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] |
Rep. Janet Yang Rohr [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1782&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1782.htm |