IL HB1777 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Collateral Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. For the City of Chicago, provides that an ordinance providing policemen and firemen with medical care and hospital treatment for accidents resulting in injury or death shall provide (1) a requirement to notify an injured employee whether he or she is entitled to benefits under the provision within a reasonable period of time after the accident causing the injury and (2) a requirement that the city provide the injured employee with benefits prior to issuing that notice. Preempts home rule powers. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-POL & FIRE-MEDICAL CARE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0202 |
2021-07-30 | House | Effective Date July 30, 2021 |
2021-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-001 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22-306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |